Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Nambi

Bishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1949 Born
15 Aug 197627.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 199546.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola
17 Mar 199646.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola
15 Jan 199747.6SucceededBishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola

MicroData Summary for José Nambi
Bishop José Nambi (born ) Bishop of Kwito-Bié

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondijimbo-Quinjemje

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kwito-Bié.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,711

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018