Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Luís António

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kwito-Bié


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1921BornCaconda
20 Jul 195231.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 197958.4AppointedBishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola
29 Jul 197958.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola
15 Jan 199776.0RetiredBishop of Kwito-Bié, Angola
25 Jul 201493.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kwito-Bié, Angola

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luís António:
Bishop Pedro Luís António (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kwito-Bié

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014