Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Viti

Archbishop Emeritus of Huambo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1933 BornMisasa-Evanga
14 Jul 196329.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 197542.0AppointedBishop of Menongue, Angola
28 Sep 197542.1Ordained BishopBishop of Menongue, Angola
12 Sep 198653.1AppointedArchbishop of Huambo, Angola
31 Jul 200370.0ResignedArchbishop of Huambo, Angola

MicroData Summary for Francisco Viti:
Archbishop Francisco Viti (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Huambo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Huambo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014