Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateus Feliciano Augusto Tomás

Deceased

Bishop of Namibe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1958BornChinguar
18 Sep 198325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Huambo, Angola
21 Mar 200951.1AppointedBishop of Namibe, Angola
21 Jun 200951.3Ordained BishopBishop of Namibe, Angola
30 Oct 201052.7DiedBishop of Namibe, Angola

MicroData Summary for Mateus Feliciano Augusto Tomás:
Bishop Mateus Feliciano Augusto Tomás (born , died ) Bishop of Namibe

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,193
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013