Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Gomes Junqueira, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nova Lisboa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1894BornEstela, Portugal
28 Oct 191824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Jun 193844.2AppointedPrefect of Cubango in Angola
28 Jan 194146.8AppointedBishop of Nova Lisboa, Angola
1 Jun 194147.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nova Lisboa, Angola
29 Jun 197076.2DiedBishop of Nova Lisboa, Angola

MicroData Summary for Daniel Gomes Junqueira:
Bishop Daniel Gomes Junqueira C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Nova Lisboa

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013