Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moisés Alves de Pinho, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1883Born
19 Dec 190825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
7 Apr 193248.7AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
17 Jul 193249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
18 Jan 194157.5AppointedArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
18 Jan 194157.5AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
17 Nov 196683.3RetiredArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
17 Nov 196683.3RetiredBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
17 Nov 196683.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perdices
27 Jan 197187.5ResignedTitular Archbishop of Perdices
26 Jun 198096.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Moisés Alves de Pinho
Archbishop Moisés Alves de Pinho C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFiães, Portugal

  • a priest for 71.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018