Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ildefonso dos Santos Silva, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Silva Porto, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1893Born
14 Oct 191723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Nov 194147.9AppointedBishop of Silva Porto, Angola
26 Jul 194248.7Ordained BishopBishop of Silva Porto, Angola
14 Aug 195864.7DiedBishop of Silva Porto, Angola

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ildefonso dos Santos Silva
Bishop Antonio Ildefonso dos Santos Silva O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Silva Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacieira, Portugal

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 35
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1959, Page 1,742
  • d: L'Osservatore Romano (Italian), 15 Aug 1958

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018