Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos da Silva Gonçalves

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1891Born
14 Aug 191322.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 194857.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guarda, Portugal
21 Jun 194857.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pionia
15 Aug 194857.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pionia
1 Feb 195261.0SucceededBishop of Guarda, Portugal
4 Jun 196069.3DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Domingos da Silva Gonçalves
Bishop Domingos da Silva Gonçalves (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paio de Guimarães

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018