Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Tirso Blanco, S.D.B.

Bishop of Lwena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1957 BornRamos Mejía, Argentina
24 Jan 198224.6ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Sep 198528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Nov 200750.5AppointedBishop of Lwena, Angola
2 Mar 200850.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lwena, Angola
9 Mar 200850.8InstalledBishop of Lwena, Angola

MicroData Summary for Jesús Tirso Blanco:
Bishop Jesús Tirso Blanco S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Lwena

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lwena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,684

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013