Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lwena

Dioecesis Lvenanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jesús Tirso Blanco, S.D.B., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 16 May 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Saurimo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 199,786 (77,167 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 88, Lwena [Moxico], Angola
  • Telephone: (54)60139

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Luso
1 July 1963ErectedDiocese of Silva Porto Diocese of Luso (erected)
Diocese of Lwena
16 May 1979Name ChangedDiocese of Luso Diocese of Lwena
12 April 2011Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Lwena (from Huambo)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Luso
196922,347176,65412.7%13031720351711ap1971
Diocese of Lwena
198039,661251,63515.8%449,9154412ap1981
199048,969260,00018.8%776,9958612ap1991
199955,285322,90917.1%65115,0258812ap2000
200056,019322,90917.3%65115,0926912ap2001
200156,894323,78417.6%46105,68911912ap2002
200256,894323,78417.6%55105,689101612ap2003
200358,900333,00017.7%47115,35481610ap2004
200458,900333,00017.7%2796,54471813ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011