Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Esteves Dias, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luso, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1920Born
11 Jul 194827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 196342.7AppointedBishop of Luso, Angola
8 Sep 196342.9Ordained BishopBishop of Luso, Angola
13 Apr 197655.5ResignedBishop of Luso, Angola
2 Dec 197757.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Luso, Angola

MicroData Summary for Francisco Esteves Dias
Bishop Francisco Esteves Dias O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSâo Vicente da Châ

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018