Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Amaral Dos Santos

Deceased

Bishop of Benguela, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1929Born
22 Dec 195627.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 197041.2AppointedBishop of Benguela, Angola
2 Aug 197041.4Ordained BishopBishop of Benguela, Angola
14 Oct 197344.6DiedBishop of Benguela, Angola

MicroData Summary for Armando Amaral Dos Santos
Bishop Armando Amaral Dos Santos (born , died ) Bishop of Benguela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapeio Chinguar

  • a priest for 16.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018