Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Altino Ribeiro de Santana

Deceased

Bishop of Beira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1915BornPorvorim do Socorro, India
9 Oct 193822.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 195539.7AppointedBishop of Sá da Bandeira, Angola
23 Oct 195540.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sá da Bandeira, Angola
19 Feb 197256.3AppointedBishop of Beira, Mozambique
27 Feb 197357.3DiedBishop of Beira, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Altino Ribeiro de Santana:
Bishop Altino Ribeiro de Santana (born , died ) Bishop of Beira

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015