Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilherme Augusto Inácio da Cunha Guimarães

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1877Born
22 Sep 190022.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 192850.5AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
2 Sep 192850.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
17 Jun 195779.5DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Guilherme Augusto Inácio da Cunha Guimarães
Bishop Guilherme Augusto Inácio da Cunha Guimarães (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Jorge de Selho

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018