Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abílio Augusto Vaz das Neves

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1894BornIfanes de Miranda Douro
7 Dec 191925.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 193339.5AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
28 Jan 193439.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
8 Dec 193844.5AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
20 Feb 196570.7ResignedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
20 Feb 196570.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Silli
27 Jan 197176.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Silli
7 Mar 198085.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Abílio Augusto Vaz das Neves:
Bishop Abílio Augusto Vaz das Neves (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013