Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugène Mederlet, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Madras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1867BornErstroff, France
8 Jul 189426.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 192860.6AppointedArchbishop of Madras, India
28 Oct 192861.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Madras, India
12 Dec 193467.1DiedArchbishop of Madras, India

MicroData Summary for Eugène Mederlet:
Archbishop Eugène Mederlet S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Madras

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013