Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Vismara, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hyderabad

Titular Bishop of Tymbrias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1867BornMilano, Italy
1 Dec 189023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
11 May 190942.2AppointedBishop of Hyderabad, India
29 Jun 190942.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hyderabad, India
19 Feb 194880.9RetiredBishop of Hyderabad, India
19 Feb 194880.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tymbrias
13 Oct 195386.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Hyderabad, India

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Vismara:
Bishop Dionisio Vismara P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hyderabad

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 39
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013