Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Anthony Bouter, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nellore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1895BornAmsterdam
17 Jul 192125.9Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
28 May 192933.8AppointedBishop of Nellore, India
8 Sep 192934.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nellore, India
16 Mar 197074.6DiedBishop of Nellore, India

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Anthony Bouter:
Bishop William Joseph Anthony Bouter M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nellore

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015