Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Maria Teixeira

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1875Born
8 Jun 190227.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 192853.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
13 Jun 192853.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinda
7 Oct 192853.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinda
25 May 192954.0SucceededBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
15 Mar 193357.8DiedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

MicroData Summary for António Maria Teixeira
Bishop António Maria Teixeira (born , died ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLigares, Portugal

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018