Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Bento Martins Ribeiro

Deceased

Bishop of Cochin, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1859Born
17 Aug 189030.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 190949.3SelectedBishop of Cochin, India
28 Feb 190949.4ConfirmedBishop of Cochin, India
15 Aug 190949.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
21 May 193171.7DiedBishop of Cochin, India

MicroData Summary for José Bento Martins Ribeiro
Bishop José Bento Martins Ribeiro (born , died ) Bishop of Cochin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouriçal do Campo, Portugal

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,909, Number 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast