Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Sebastião Valente

Deceased

Patriarch of East Indies

Archbishop of Goa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1846BornPorto de Santa María
23 Sep 187125.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 May 187226.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 188135.5AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
25 Sep 188135.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
1 Sep 188640.6AppointedPatriarch of East Indies, India
25 Jan 190862.0DiedPatriarch of East Indies, India

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sebastião Valente:
Patriarch Antonio Sebastião Valente (born , died ) Patriarch of East Indies

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013