Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Matheus de Oliveira Xavier

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa e Damão, India

Patriarch of East Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1858Born
11 Jun 188122.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 189738.9AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
26 Feb 190950.3AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
26 Feb 190950.3AppointedPatriarch of East Indies, India
19 May 192970.5DiedArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India

MicroData Summary for Matheus de Oliveira Xavier (VIAF: 89317081)
Patriarch Matheus de Oliveira Xavier (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa e Damão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValle de Urra, Diocese of Portalegre, Portugal
Ordained BishopGoa, Archdiocese of Goa e Damão

  • a priest for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 213
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017