Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ángel María Pérez y Cecilia, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Verapoly

Titular Archbishop of Novae Patrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1872BornBurgos, Spain
10 Jun 189523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
18 Jun 191543.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Verapoly, India
18 Jun 191543.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
28 Oct 191543.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
18 Dec 191846.9SucceededArchbishop of Verapoly, India
6 Mar 191947.1InstalledArchbishop of Verapoly, India
12 Nov 193462.8ResignedArchbishop of Verapoly, India
12 Nov 193462.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novae Patrae
14 Jun 194573.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Ángel María Pérez y Cecilia:
Archbishop Ángel María Pérez y Cecilia O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Verapoly

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 35
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013