Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Wladyslaw Michal Zaleski

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1852BornVeliuona, Lithuania
15 Mar 189239.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
15 Mar 189239.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to India
15 May 189240.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
7 Dec 191664.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
5 Oct 192573.4DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Wladyslaw Michal Zaleski:
Patriarch Wladyslaw Michal Zaleski (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 546
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013