Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bede Beckmeyer, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1873Born
23 Jun 189925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Apr 191238.5AppointedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
30 Jun 191238.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
22 May 193561.6DiedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Bede Beckmeyer
Bishop Bede Beckmeyer O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Kandy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatale

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,936
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • op: Website of the Diocese, 19 Aug 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,912, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast