Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Laudadio, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galle, Sri Lanka

Titular Bishop of Ala Miliaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1891Born
26 Jul 192130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 May 193443.1AppointedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
30 Sep 193443.4Ordained BishopBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
26 May 196473.1RetiredBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
26 May 196473.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ala Miliaria
1 Apr 196977.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Galle, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Nicola Laudadio
Bishop Nicola Laudadio S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoicattaro

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 67
  • bd/op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1969, Page 544

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast