Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-André Brault, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaffna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1867BornBrain-sur-l’Authion, France
29 Sep 189023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
5 Aug 191952.4AppointedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
14 Feb 192052.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
20 Jan 192355.8DiedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Jules-André Brault:
Bishop Jules-André Brault O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaffna

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013