Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Coudert, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Colombo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1861BornManglieu, France
10 Apr 188625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
28 Jun 189837.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
28 Jun 189837.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Balanea
30 Nov 189837.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Balanea
27 Jun 190544.3SucceededArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
31 Mar 192968.0DiedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Antoine Coudert:
Archbishop Antoine Coudert O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Colombo

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 139, and Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013