Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Menacherry

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)

Titular Bishop of Paralus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1857BornNjarackal
11 Aug 188326.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 189639.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
11 Aug 189639.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paralus
25 Oct 189639.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paralus
4 Nov 189639.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
19 Dec 191962.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for John Menacherry
Bishop John Menacherry (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Trichur

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 439
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jul 2016