Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Makil

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India

Titular Bishop of Tralles in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1850Born
30 May 187424.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 189646.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
11 Aug 189646.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
25 Oct 189646.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tralles in Asia
30 Aug 191161.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
26 Jan 191463.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Matthew Makil
Bishop Matthew Makil (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kottayam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManjoor
Ordained BishopKandy, Diocese of Kandy, Sri Lanka

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 560
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jul 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017