Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François Gayet, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nagpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1885BornLa Chapelle-Blanche, France
8 Nov 190823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
1 Feb 193449.0AppointedBishop of Nagpur, India
24 Jun 193449.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nagpur, India
26 Aug 195065.6DiedBishop of Nagpur, India

MicroData Summary for Louis-François Gayet:
Bishop Louis-François Gayet M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Nagpur

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013