Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Alphonse Baud, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Visakhapatnam, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1890Born
2 Aug 191424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
23 Dec 194151.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vizagapatam, India
23 Dec 194151.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodopolis
17 Mar 194251.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodopolis
22 Mar 194756.6SucceededBishop of Vizagapatam, India
4 Oct 196676.1RetiredBishop of Visakhapatnam, India
4 Oct 196676.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
23 Jan 197180.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Troas
13 Mar 198089.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Visakhapatnam, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Alphonse Baud
Bishop Joseph-Alphonse Baud M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Visakhapatnam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellevaux, Diocese of Annecy, France
Ordained BishopSt. Aloysius’ Grounds, Visakhapatnam, Diocese of Vizagapatam

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018