Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Albert Rosario, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amravati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1915BornNagpur
29 Sep 194429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
8 May 195539.9AppointedBishop of Amravati, India
13 Nov 195540.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amravati, India
1 Apr 199579.8RetiredBishop of Amravati, India
31 Jul 201196.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Amravati, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Albert Rosario:
Bishop Joseph Albert Rosario M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amravati

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 55.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 1 Aug 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1955, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013