Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Amravati

Dioecesis Amravatensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Elias Gonsalves, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 8 May 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nagpur
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 46,447 (17,940 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Amravati Camp P.O., Amravati 444602, Maharashtra State, India
  • Telephone: (0721) 2663.171
  • Fax: 2666.403

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
8 May 1955ErectedArchdiocese of Nagpur Diocese of Amravati (erected)
29 July 1968Territory LostDiocese of Amravati
Archdiocese of Nagpur
Apostolic Exarchate of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
17 December 1977Territory LostDiocese of Amravati
Archdiocese of Hyderabad
Diocese of Aurangabad (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195815,9566,462,992.2%712198398812ap1960
197018,8008,400,000.2%18112964813127ap1971
19806,1595,842,000.1%15520307912914ap1981
19906,8137,967,000.1%184223091016417ap1991
19997,6708,380,810.1%25631247819020ap2000
20007,7288,386,310.1%26632241718519ap2001
20017,8358,396,310.1%29534230718621ap2002
20027,9409,941,903.1%29534233719422ap2003
20037,15510,041,903.1%31435204619723ap2004
20047,23010,141,903.1%29332225520123ap2005
20066,22410,182,215.1%31334183620723ap2007
20125,05410,930,000.0%319401261536719ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013