Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lourdes Daniel

Bishop of Nashik


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1947 BornDehu Road
19 Apr 198033.2Ordained PriestPriest of Poona, India
8 Jun 200760.3AppointedBishop of Amravati, India
2 Aug 200760.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amravati, India
11 Nov 201063.7AppointedBishop of Nashik, India

MicroData Summary for Lourdes Daniel:
Bishop Lourdes Daniel (born ) Bishop of Nashik

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nashik.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,486
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013