Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)

Eparchia Chandaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ephrem Nariculam, Bishop
  • Vijay Anand Nedumpuram, C.M.I., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)
29 July 1968ErectedDiocese of Amravati
Archdiocese of Nagpur
Apostolic Exarchate of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
Eparchy of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)
26 February 1977ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese) Eparchy of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)
23 June 1999Territory LostEparchy of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese) Diocese of Adilabad (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)
19707,0003,000,000.2%5050140506847ap1971
Eparchy of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)
198014,000964731917317036ap1981
199022,8054,219,000.5%1054643568522654ap1991
199920,5005,702,639.4%13748723520537253ap2000
200012,8773,620,160.4%12465822217026234ap2001
200112,8913,620,160.4%16466220718430433ap2002
200212,9803,620,160.4%1640562311713105ap2003
200312,8913,635,134.4%1739562301663545ap2004
200412,9253,650,225.4%1739562301653605ap2005
200613,6123,659,415.4%2240622192773525ap2007
200914,7573,764,000.4%2243652272073545ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014