Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vijay Anand Nedumpuram, C.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1938 BornCherpumkal
17 May 196728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
20 Apr 199051.6AppointedBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
3 Jul 199051.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
31 Jul 201475.9RetiredBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Vijay Anand Nedumpuram:
Bishop Vijay Anand Nedumpuram C.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,429
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014