Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kunnath, C.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1939 BornKodancherry
24 Apr 197232.6Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
23 Jun 199959.7AppointedBishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Oct 199960.0Ordained BishopBishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Aug 201575.9RetiredBishop of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kunnath:
Bishop Joseph Kunnath C.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Adilabad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Adilabad (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,636
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 28 Aug 2015