Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese)

Dioecesis Iagdalpurensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Kollamparampil, C.M.I., Bishop
  • Simon Stock Palathara, C.M.I., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese)
23 March 1972ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Raipur Apostolic Exarchate of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
Diocese of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese)
26 February 1977ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese) Diocese of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese)
27 February 2004Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese) (from Bhopal)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabarese)
19801,01624244239723ap1981
19902,7372,301,000.1%42832855114412ap1991
19994,8762,271,314.2%44650978819811ap2000
20005,3092,271,314.2%443471128823311ap2001
20015,5572,672,651.2%650569918824411ap2002
20025,8702,672,651.2%753609718026011ap2003
20036,3622,673,651.2%7485511517525411ap2004
20046,3452,673,651.2%857659718925412ap2005
20066,4492,743,630.2%126072898626012ap2007
20097,8692,953,469.3%176885929730419ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014