Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Joseph Abreo

Deceased

Bishop of Aurangabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1923Born
5 Dec 195431.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 197754.4AppointedBishop of Aurangabad, India
9 Apr 197854.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aurangabad, India
1 May 198763.8DiedBishop of Aurangabad, India

MicroData Summary for Dominic Joseph Abreo
Bishop Dominic Joseph Abreo (born , died ) Bishop of Aurangabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManickpur

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018