Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Baroi, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krishnagar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1925BornNarikelbari
8 Dec 195732.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Sep 197348.0AppointedBishop of Krishnagar, India
15 Dec 197348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Krishnagar, India
4 Apr 198357.6DiedBishop of Krishnagar, India

MicroData Summary for Matthew Baroi:
Bishop Matthew Baroi S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Krishnagar

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013