Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Kerketta, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tezpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1932Born
11 Feb 196330.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 May 197037.5AppointedBishop of Dibrugarh, India
18 Oct 197037.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dibrugarh, India
24 Oct 198048.0AppointedBishop of Tezpur, India
3 Dec 200775.1RetiredBishop of Tezpur, India
22 Dec 201886.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tezpur, India

MicroData Summary for Robert Kerketta
Bishop Robert Kerketta S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tezpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmadanga
Death PlaceBaptist Christian, Hospital, Tezpur, Diocese of Tezpur

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2007
  • d: CB, 22 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Dec 2018

Quantcast