Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tarcisius Resto Phanrang, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Shillong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1929BornTyrna
26 Jun 196030.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Jun 199060.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Shillong-Gauhati, India
11 Jun 199060.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corniculana
23 Sep 199060.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corniculana
2 Aug 199565.8AppointedArchbishop of Shillong, India
5 May 199969.6DiedArchbishop of Shillong, India

MicroData Summary for Tarcisius Resto Phanrang:
Archbishop Tarcisius Resto Phanrang S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Shillong

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,595
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013