Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orestes Marengo, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tezpur

Titular Bishop of Arsacal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1906BornDiano d'Alba
2 Apr 193225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Jul 195144.8AppointedBishop of Dibrugarh, India
27 Dec 195145.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dibrugarh, India
6 Jul 196457.8AppointedBishop of Tezpur, India
26 Jun 196962.8ResignedBishop of Tezpur, India
26 Jun 196962.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsacal
1 Mar 197366.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tura, India
12 Jan 197972.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Tura, India
30 Jul 199891.9DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Tura, India

MicroData Summary for Orestes Marengo
Bishop Orestes Marengo S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tezpur

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016