Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Mamalassery

Bishop Emeritus of Tura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1932 BornKalathoor
23 Apr 196028.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 197946.7AppointedBishop of Tura, India
19 Mar 197946.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tura, India
21 Apr 200775.0RetiredBishop of Tura, India

MicroData Summary for George Mamalassery:
Bishop George Mamalassery (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tura

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013