Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Marak

Bishop of Tura, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1950 Born
10 Feb 198232.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tura, India
3 Jun 200454.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tura, India
3 Oct 200454.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tura, India
21 Apr 200757.2SucceededBishop of Tura, India

MicroData Summary for Andrew Marak
Bishop Andrew Marak (born ) Bishop of Tura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChimagre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,700
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast