Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Stoppa

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1881BornCerano
2 Apr 190422.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 194361.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy
17 Apr 194361.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
23 May 194361.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
2 Oct 194564.0AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
27 Dec 194867.3AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
13 Feb 196583.4DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Stoppa:
Bishop Carlo Stoppa (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,232
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013