Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Dadone

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1908Born
4 Apr 193122.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 195243.3AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
1 Jun 195243.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
17 Sep 196354.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fossano, Italy
1965²56.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alba (Pompea), Italy
2 Feb 196859.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Alba (Pompea), Italy
29 Oct 198071.9DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Dadone
Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Dadone (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrù

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 26 Feb 2018