Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Borra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fossano, Italy

Titular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1886Born
29 Jun 191023.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 194356.5AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
29 Jun 194356.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
2 Sep 196376.8RetiredBishop of Fossano, Italy
2 Sep 196376.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zeugma in Syria
7 Jan 1972³85.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Borra
Bishop Dionisio Borra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbiano di Ivrea

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018