Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ilario Roatta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1905Born
29 Jun 192722.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 195145.9AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
17 Jun 195146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Norcia, Italy
8 Mar 196054.8AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
2 Jan 198276.7RetiredBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
13 Dec 199186.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ilario Roatta
Bishop Ilario Roatta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrale di Ormea

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 57
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018